DC B22-0987 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-14 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-14 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill authorizes the issuance of tax increment financing (TIF), not to exceed $60.8 million, to support infrastructure and site costs for an approximately 560,000 square-foot development across three buildings adjacent to Martin Luther King, Jr. Avenue SE; Shannon Place SE; Railroad Avenue SE; V Street SE; and W Street SE in Ward 8.
Title
Reunion Square Tax Increment Financing Act Of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-10-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0987 Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2018-10-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0987 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/41029/B22-0987-Introduction.pdf |