DC B22-0969 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-09 - Act A22-0495, Expires on January 29, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12321
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-09 - Act A22-0495, Expires on January 29, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12321
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With Precision Truck Repair, Inc.
Title
Modifications To Contract No. Cw25390 With Precision Truck Repair, Inc. Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-16 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-09 | Council | Act A22-0495, Expires on January 29, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12321 |
2018-10-31 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0495 |
2018-10-31 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0495 |
2018-10-18 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 1, 2018 |
2018-10-16 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-10-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-09-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |