DC B22-0948 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-08 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-08 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes the Small Business Bonding Program to provide training, financial, and technical assistance to eligible participants. It also requires that 5% of certain penalties and fees collected by the Department of Small and Local Business Development be used for the administration of the program.
Title
Small Business Bonding Program Establishment Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-10-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-09-28 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0948 Published in the DC Register |
2018-09-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2018-09-18 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0948 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/40926/B22-0948-Introduction.pdf |