DC B22-0919 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-13 - First Reading CC
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill allows condominium contraction by the owner's association and establishes the steps to do so.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fair Condominium Withdrawal Amendment Act Of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-13CouncilFirst Reading CC
2018-11-07CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-11-07CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0919
2018-10-29CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2018-10-12CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2018-09-18CouncilReferred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization
2018-07-20CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0919 Published in the DC Register
2018-07-12CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback