DC B22-0916 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Signed with Act Number A22-0601
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Signed with Act Number A22-0601
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill prohibits buses from operating or parking on certain streets near Southwest Waterfront Park. Violators are subject to a fine of $150.
Title
Southwest Waterfront Park Bus Prohibition Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0601 |
2019-01-24 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0601 |
2019-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 28, 2019 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-12-04 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-11-28 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-27 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0916 |
2018-11-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-11-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-09-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2018-07-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0916 Published in the DC Register |
2018-07-09 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |