DC B22-0915 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill provides a 20-year abatement of real property taxes on real property located in Lot 801 in Square 643-S in Ward 6, known as the Randall School Contemporary Art Museum and Housing Development.
Title
Randall School Museum And Housing Development Real Property Tax Abatement Act Of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-11-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-11-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-09-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2018-07-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0915 Published in the DC Register |
2018-07-09 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0915 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/40681/B22-0915-Introduction.pdf |