DC B22-0914 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-18 - Signed with Act Number A22-0584
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-18 - Signed with Act Number A22-0584
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill requires that internet sales tax be collected from online retailers that meet certain requirements including gross revenue from sales in the District of Columbia exceeds one hundred thousand dollars or the seller conducts two hundred or more separate transactions in a 12-month period. The generated revenues will be directed to lower commercial property tax rates.
Title
Internet Sales Tax Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 6 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-18 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0584 |
2019-01-18 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0584 |
2019-01-03 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 18, 2019 |
2018-12-04 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-12-04 | Council | Amendment (Nadeau) |
2018-11-13 | Council | First Reading |
2018-11-07 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0914 |
2018-10-10 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-09-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-07-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0914 Published in the DC Register |
2018-07-10 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2018-07-09 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |