DC B22-0911 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-04 - Final Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill allows the Office of Public-Private Partnerships to delegate its contracting authority for public-private partnership agreements to the Office of Contracting and Procurement. Among other things, it requires the submission to the Council of the core elements of a proposed request for proposals and requires active approval by the Council of such requests.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office Of Public-private Partnerships Delegation And Council Review Amendment Act Of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-04 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Reconsideration, Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-04CouncilFinal Reading
2018-12-04CouncilAmendment (Mendelson)
2018-12-04CouncilReconsideration, Final Reading
2018-11-20CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-11-13CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0911
2018-11-13CouncilFirst Reading CC
2018-10-18CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2018-09-14CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2018-07-20CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0911 Published in the DC Register
2018-07-10CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2018-07-10CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback