DC B22-0895 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Eviction Procedure Reform Emergency Amendment Act Of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eviction Procedure Reform Emergency Amendment Act Of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-10 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-18CouncilRetained by the Council
2018-08-03CouncilAct A22-0426, Expires on October 24, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7985
2018-07-26CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0426
2018-07-11CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 25, 2018
2018-07-10CouncilFinal Reading
2018-07-10CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback