DC B22-0879 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-14 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-14 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill designates the portion of the public alley system within Square 514, bounded by 5th Street, N.W., M Street, N.W., 4th Street, N.W., and New York Avenue, N.W. in Ward 6, as Crowdy Court.
Title
Crowdy Court Designation Act Of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-10-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-07-10 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2018-07-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0879 Published in the DC Register |
2018-06-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0879 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/40570/B22-0879-Introduction.pdf |