DC B22-0877 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-04 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-04 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill expands the crime of extortion to include threatening notification of law enforcement officials about another person's immigration status, if that threat is made, as an attempt, to obtain that persons property, labor, or services.
Title
Protecting Immigrants From Extortion Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-04 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-08-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-07-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0877 Published in the DC Register |
2018-06-26 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2018-06-26 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0877 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/40530/B22-0877-Introduction.pdf |