DC B22-0862 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Act A22-0405, Expires on October 15, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7525
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Act A22-0405, Expires on October 15, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7525
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Campaign Finance Reform And Transparency Emergency Amendment Act Of 2018
Title
Campaign Finance Reform And Transparency Emergency Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-20 | Council | Act A22-0405, Expires on October 15, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7525 |
2018-07-17 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0405 |
2018-07-10 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-06-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 16, 2018 |
2018-06-26 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-06-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |