DC B22-0858 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Act A22-0418, Expires on October 17, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7691
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Act A22-0418, Expires on October 17, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7691
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifications To Contract No. Cw37196 With Unity Health Care, Inc. Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2018
Title
Modifications To Contract No. Cw37196 With Unity Health Care, Inc. Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-27 | Council | Act A22-0418, Expires on October 17, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7691 |
2018-07-19 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0418 |
2018-07-19 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0418 |
2018-07-09 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 23, 2018 |
2018-06-26 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-06-26 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-06-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |