DC B22-0838 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-10-04 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill establishes an Elder Abuse Response Team to coordinate services available to victims of elder abuse cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elder Abuse Response Team Act Of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-04CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2018-08-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2018-06-08CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0838 Published in the DC Register
2018-06-05CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2018-06-05CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback