DC B22-0825 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-13 - Act A22-0393, Expires on September 27, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7341
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-13 - Act A22-0393, Expires on September 27, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7341
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Community Violence Interruption Fund Emergency Act Of 2018
Title
Community Violence Interruption Fund Emergency Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-13 | Council | Act A22-0393, Expires on September 27, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7341 |
2018-06-29 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0393 |
2018-06-14 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 28, 2018 |
2018-06-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-06-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-05-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |