DC B22-0824 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Act A22-0386, Expires on September 23, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7007
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Act A22-0386, Expires on September 23, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7007
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With 5th Street Partners, LLC
Title
Change Order Nos. 1 Through 4 To Contract No. Dcam-17-cs-0020 Approval And Payment Emergency Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Council | Act A22-0386, Expires on September 23, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7007 |
2018-06-25 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0386 |
2018-06-25 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0386 |
2018-06-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 25, 2018 |
2018-06-05 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-06-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-05-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |