DC B22-0807 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-18 - Signed with Act Number A22-0582
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-18 - Signed with Act Number A22-0582
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill requires that any amendment to the terms "medical necessity" or "medically necessary" in the DCMR be issued by the Department of Behavioral Health via rulemaking. It also requires that the Department issue rules to establish the criteria to make this determination subject to Council approval.
Title
Medical Necessity Review Criteria Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-18 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0582 |
2019-01-18 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0582 |
2019-01-03 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 18, 2019 |
2018-12-04 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-11-13 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-10-19 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-10-04 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0807 |
2018-06-22 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-06-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-05-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0807 Published in the DC Register |
2018-05-01 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2018-05-01 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |