DC B22-0780 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill limits the availability of civil protection orders to intimate partners, household members, family members, and victims of sexual assault and abuse or sex trafficking. It expands the ability of minors to file civil protection orders. Among other things it establishes a civil protection process serving unit within the Metropolitan Police Department and creates new anti-stalking orders.
Title
Intrafamily Offenses And Anti-stalking Orders Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-05-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-04-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0780 Published in the DC Register |
2018-04-10 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2018-04-10 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0780 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/40030/B22-0780-Introduction.pdf |