DC B22-0776 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Signed with Act Number A22-0597
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Signed with Act Number A22-0597
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This bill will be referred to the Committee on Education until September 30, 2018 and then to the Committee of the Whole.
As introduced, this bill establishes the District of Columbia Education Research Advisory Board (Board) and the District of Columbia Education Research Collaborative (Collaborative). Among other things, it requires the Collaborative to audit District school data and data collection policies and conduct long-term education research. The Board's responsibilities are to provide guidance to the Collaborative, to report to the Council on District data management and collection policies, and assist in soliciting funding grants from individuals, foundations, granting institutions, and other entities to finance the work of the Collaborative.
Title
District Of Columbia Education Research Advisory Board And Collaborative Establishment Amendment Act Of 2018 (now Known As "district Of Columbia Education Research Practice Partnership Establishment And Audit Act Of 2018)
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0597 |
2019-01-24 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0597 |
2019-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 28, 2019 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-12-18 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2018-12-10 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-12-04 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0776 |
2018-12-04 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-09-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-09-24 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0776 |
2018-09-18 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2018-07-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-06-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-04-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0776 Published in the DC Register |
2018-04-10 | Council | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-04-10 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |