DC B22-0772 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Act A22-0316, Expires on July 12, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 4285
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Act A22-0316, Expires on July 12, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 4285
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dedicated Funding For The Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Emergency Act Of 2018
Title
Dedicated Funding For The Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Emergency Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-20 | Council | Act A22-0316, Expires on July 12, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 4285 |
2018-04-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-04-13 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0316 |
2018-04-13 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0316 |
2018-04-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 26, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-04-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |