DC B22-0769 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Act A22-0331, Expires on July 31, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5052
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Boris Nemtsov Plaza Designation Congressional Review Emergency Act Of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Boris Nemtsov Plaza Designation Congressional Review Emergency Act Of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-10 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11CouncilAct A22-0331, Expires on July 31, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5052
2018-05-03CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0331
2018-05-03CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0331
2018-04-19CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 3, 2018
2018-04-17CouncilRetained by the Council
2018-04-10CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-04-09CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback