DC B22-0761 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-26 - Law Number L22-0161 Effective from October 11, 2018, Projected Law Date is October 9, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-26 - Law Number L22-0161 Effective from October 11, 2018, Projected Law Date is October 9, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-161 adds designated properties to the Golden Triangle BID, revises the rates of assessment, and establishes the residential tax rate for residential members of the Golden Triangle Business Improvement District.
Title
Golden Triangle Business Improvement District Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-26 | Council | Law Number L22-0161 Effective from October 11, 2018, Projected Law Date is October 9, 2018 |
2018-08-28 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is October 9, 2018 |
2018-07-27 | Council | Act A22-0413 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7680 |
2018-07-19 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0413 |
2018-07-19 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0413 |
2018-07-09 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 23, 2018 |
2018-06-26 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-06-05 | Council | First Reading |
2018-05-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-05-30 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0761 |
2018-04-30 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-04-13 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-04-10 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2018-03-30 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0761 Published in the DC Register |
2018-03-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |