DC B22-0758 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill establishes a two-year pilot program to reduce preterm births. It establishes a comprehensive newborn screening program, establishes discharge standards and authorizes penalties for failure to comply with the standards or to perform the necessary screens. It also authorizes the Department of Health to collect data and replaces the Committee on Metabolic Disorders with the Perinatal and Infant Health Advisory Committee. Lastly, it authorizes the Mayor to conduct a breastfeeding facilities survey of government offices and building and report annually.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Better Access For Babies To Integrated Equitable Services Act Of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-11CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2018-06-01CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2018-04-10CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2018-03-30CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0758 Published in the DC Register
2018-03-22CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback