DC B22-0744 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-11 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-11 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill permits optometrists to prescribe certain analgesics included in Schedule II through V controlled substances for the treatment of diseases of the human eye and its adjacent structures. Optometrists are no longer required to consult with a medical provider prior to treating glaucoma.
Title
Optometry Practice Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-06-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-03-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2018-03-16 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0744 Published in the DC Register |
2018-03-09 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0744 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/39896/B22-0744-Introduction.pdf |