DC B22-0738 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-09 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-09 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes the Office of Special Capital Projects as a subordinate agency within the executive branch responsible for managing the capital improvement and construction programs as designated by the Mayor. Among other things, it establishes the organizational functions of the office and describes the responsibilities of the Director.
Title
Office Of Special Capital Projects Establishment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-06-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-03-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0738 Published in the DC Register |
2018-03-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2018-03-06 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0738 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/39835/B22-0738-Introduction.pdf |