DC B22-0702 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Act A22-0287, Expires on June 23, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 3324
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Personal Delivery Device Pilot Program Extension Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal Delivery Device Pilot Program Extension Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30CouncilAct A22-0287, Expires on June 23, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 3324
2018-03-26CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0287
2018-03-26CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0287
2018-03-14CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 28, 2018
2018-03-06CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-03-06CouncilRetained by the Council
2018-03-01CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback