DC B22-0696 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Law Number L22-0101 Effective from June 5, 2018, Expires on January 16, 2019, Projected Law Date is June 2, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Law Number L22-0101 Effective from June 5, 2018, Expires on January 16, 2019, Projected Law Date is June 2, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pools Without Penalties Temporary Act Of 2018
Title
Pools Without Penalties Temporary Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | Council | Law Number L22-0101 Effective from June 5, 2018, Expires on January 16, 2019, Projected Law Date is June 2, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is June 2, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | Council | Act A22-0302 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 3771 |
2018-04-04 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0302 |
2018-04-04 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0302 |
2018-03-22 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 5, 2018 |
2018-03-06 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-02-20 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-02-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0696 Published in the DC Register |
2018-02-06 | Council | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |