DC B22-0689 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-22 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-22 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes standards for Department of Health inspection of resident files and resident agreements. It establishes the right to civil action against an Assisted Living Residence (ALR) for violations. It requires an ALR to develop policies for daily operations, treatment plans, grievances and emergencies. It requires certain staff to resident ratios. It sets standards for transfer and discharge of residents and establishes a resident's absolute right to reside in and have access to one's living unit at all times.
Title
Omnibus Assisted Living Residence Improvement And Quality Long Term Care Act Of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-06-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-02-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-02-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0689 Published in the DC Register |
2018-02-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2018-02-06 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0689 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/39683/B22-0689-Introduction.pdf |