DC B22-0684 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill authorizes the Mayor to reclassify blighted vacant properties as vacant properties when provided with evidence that a property owner will meet the vacant property definition prior to final inspection. It also establishes the criteria used to determine that a vacant building is not a blighted vacant building.
Provisions of this bill have been incorporated in Bill 22-317.
Title
Blighted Property Redevelopment Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-06-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-06-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-02-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0684 Published in the DC Register |
2018-02-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-06 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0684 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/39678/B22-0684-Introduction.pdf |