DC B22-0675 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Act A22-0261, Expires on May 22, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2109
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Act A22-0261, Expires on May 22, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2109
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification Nos. 17 And 18 To Contract No. Dcfa-2015-c-2292-ss/cw370392 With Pfc Associates, Llc Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2018
Title
Modification Nos. 17 And 18 To Contract No. Dcfa-2015-c-2292-ss/cw370392 With Pfc Associates, Llc Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Council | Act A22-0261, Expires on May 22, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2109 |
2018-02-21 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0261 |
2018-02-21 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0261 |
2018-02-12 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 27, 2018 |
2018-02-06 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-02-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-01-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |