DC B22-0662 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Act A22-0636 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill requires that on or before December 1, 2018, and by December 1 of every subsequent year, the District of Columbia Water and Sewer Authority shall provide the Council and the Mayor an annual report detailing customer inquiries and complaints received and their outcomes. Among things it grants the Office of People's Counsel authority to represent District residents in matters related to DC Water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dc Water Consumer Protection Amendment Act Of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15CouncilAct A22-0636 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2020
2019-02-06CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0636
2019-02-06CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0636
2019-01-23CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 6, 2019
2018-12-18CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-12-04CouncilFirst Reading CC
2018-11-28CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-11-27CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0662
2018-07-12CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2018-07-06CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2018-06-22CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2018-01-12CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0662 Published in the DC Register
2018-01-09CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2018-01-09CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback