DC B22-0655 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Law Number L22-0182 Effective from November 27, 2018, Projected Law Date is November 23, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Law Number L22-0182 Effective from November 27, 2018, Projected Law Date is November 23, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-182 clarifies that a nominee for the Housing Production Trust Fund Board shall be deemed disapproved if the Council does not approve by resolution the nomination within the 90-day period of review.
Title
Housing Production Trust Fund Board Nominee Confirmation Clarification Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-09-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-10 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-10 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Council | Law Number L22-0182 Effective from November 27, 2018, Projected Law Date is November 23, 2018 |
2018-10-12 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is November 23, 2018 |
2018-10-12 | Council | Act A22-0456 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 11202 |
2018-10-03 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0456 |
2018-10-03 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0456 |
2018-09-24 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 9, 2018 |
2018-09-18 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-07-10 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-07-02 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-07-02 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0655 |
2018-06-01 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-05-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-05-21 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-05-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-01-23 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2018-01-12 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0655 Published in the DC Register |
2018-01-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |