DC B22-0652 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Law Number L22-0089 Effective from April 25, 2018, Expires on December 6, 2018, Projected Law Date is April 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Law Number L22-0089 Effective from April 25, 2018, Expires on December 6, 2018, Projected Law Date is April 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extension Of Time To Dispose Of 8th & O Streets, N.w., Temporary Act Of 2018
Title
Extension Of Time To Dispose Of 8th & O Streets, N.w., Temporary Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Council | Law Number L22-0089 Effective from April 25, 2018, Expires on December 6, 2018, Projected Law Date is April 25, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is April 25, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Council | Act A22-0272 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2372 |
2018-02-28 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0272 |
2018-02-28 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0272 |
2018-02-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-06 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-01-09 | Council | First Reading |
2018-01-09 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-01-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |