DC B22-0647 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-02 - Act A22-0238, Expires on April 27, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 819
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-02 - Act A22-0238, Expires on April 27, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 819
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Board Of Directors Appointment Emergency Amendment Act Of 2018
Title
Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Board Of Directors Appointment Emergency Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-09 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | Council | Act A22-0238, Expires on April 27, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 819 |
2018-01-27 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0238 |
2018-01-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2018 |
2018-01-09 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-01-09 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-01-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |