DC B22-0645 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-02 - Act A22-0234, Expires on April 25, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 811
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-02 - Act A22-0234, Expires on April 25, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 811
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
with Friendship Place
Title
Modification No.1 To Contract No. Cw54105 Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-09 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | Council | Act A22-0234, Expires on April 25, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 811 |
2018-01-25 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0234 |
2018-01-25 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0234 |
2018-01-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2018 |
2018-01-09 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-01-09 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-12-21 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |