DC B22-0643 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Act A22-0259, Expires on May 22, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2105
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Act A22-0259, Expires on May 22, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2105
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With Ascot Underwriting Bermuda LTD
Title
Contract No. Nfphc-207 With Ascot Underwriting Bermuda, Ltd Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Council | Act A22-0259, Expires on May 22, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2105 |
2018-02-21 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0259 |
2018-02-21 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0259 |
2018-02-12 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 27, 2018 |
2018-02-06 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-01-09 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-12-21 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |