DC B22-0633 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-19 - Act A22-0227, Expires on April 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 326
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-19 - Act A22-0227, Expires on April 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 326
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Homeless Shelter Replacement Emergency Amendment Act Of 2017
Title
Homeless Shelter Replacement Emergency Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-19 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-19 | Council | Act A22-0227, Expires on April 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 326 |
2018-01-10 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0227 |
2018-01-10 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0227 |
2017-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 16, 2018 |
2017-12-19 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-12-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-12-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |