DC B22-0626 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-12 - Act A22-0464, Expires on January 3, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 11377
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-12 - Act A22-0464, Expires on January 3, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 11377
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revised Synthetics Abatement And Full Enforcement Drug Control Emergency Amendment Act Of 2017
Title
Revised Synthetics Abatement And Full Enforcement Drug Control Emergency Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-02 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-12 | Council | Act A22-0464, Expires on January 3, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 11377 |
2018-10-05 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0464 |
2018-10-05 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0464 |
2018-10-03 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 18, 2018 |
2018-10-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-10-02 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Allen) |
2017-12-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-12-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |