DC B22-0622 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Law Number L22-0071 Effective from March 28, 2018, Expires on November 8, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Medical Necessity Review Criteria Temporary Amendment Act Of 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Necessity Review Criteria Temporary Amendment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-09 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04CouncilLaw Number L22-0071 Effective from March 28, 2018, Expires on November 8, 2018
2018-02-13CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2018-02-09CouncilAct A22-0242 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 1366
2018-01-31CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0242
2018-01-31CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0242
2018-01-22CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 5, 2018
2018-01-09CouncilFinal Reading CC
2017-12-19CouncilRetained by the Council
2017-12-08CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0622 Published in the DC Register
2017-12-05CouncilFirst Reading
2017-12-05CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback