DC B22-0617 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-10 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-10 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill requires that all applicants' age and residency must be certified by DOES prior to receiving placement. It sets time frames for placement and requires all host employers and sites be finalized before May 15. DOES shall provide age appropriate program placements as well as provide additional support for applicants and participants with disabilities.
Title
Marion S. Barry Summer Youth Employment Program Enhancement Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-12-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-12-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0617 Published in the DC Register |
2017-12-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2017-12-05 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0617 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/39351/B22-0617-Introduction.pdf |