DC B22-0613 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on November 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on November 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes the Department of General Services (DGS) as the agency to solicit, review, and approve permits for community access of a school's facilities and grounds. DGS will also remit the majority of permit fees to the school's principal for maintenance and repair.
FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Ensuring Community Access To Recreational Space Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-16 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019 |
2018-11-16 | Council | Act A22-0511 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12598 |
2018-11-07 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0511 |
2018-10-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 6, 2018 |
2018-10-16 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-10-02 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-09-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-09-25 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0613 |
2018-01-10 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-12-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-12-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0613 Published in the DC Register |
2017-12-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2017-12-05 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |