DC B22-0611 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-29 - Act A22-0213, Expires on March 19, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 13422
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Fiscal Year 2018 Budget Support Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fiscal Year 2018 Budget Support Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-29CouncilAct A22-0213, Expires on March 19, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 13422
2017-12-20CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0213
2017-12-20CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0213
2017-12-19CouncilRetained by the Council
2017-12-08CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 22, 2017
2017-12-05CouncilFinal Reading CC
2017-12-04CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback