DC B22-0607 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-22 - Act A22-0205, Expires on March 13, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12879
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-22 - Act A22-0205, Expires on March 13, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12879
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Historic Anacostia Vacant Properties Surplus Declaration And Disposition Emergency Approval Act Of 2017
Title
Historic Anacostia Vacant Properties Surplus Declaration And Disposition Emergency Approval Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Council - Amendments #1-6 (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Council - Amendments #1-6 (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-22 | Council | Act A22-0205, Expires on March 13, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12879 |
2017-12-13 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0205 |
2017-12-13 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0205 |
2017-12-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 22, 2017 |
2017-12-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-12-05 | Council | Amendments #1-6 (Mendelson) |
2017-12-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-12-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |