DC B22-0580 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill requires the Mayor to design and issue motor vehicle identification tags with a separate design for each branch of the United States Armed Forces.
Provisions incorporated into Bill 22-500.
Title
Veterans Specialty License Plate Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-02-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-01-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-11-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0580 Published in the DC Register |
2017-11-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2017-11-07 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0580 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/39188/B22-0580-Introduction.pdf |