DC B22-0569 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes guidelines regarding the administration of oxygen therapy in nursing facilities.
Title
Oxygen Therapy Regulation Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-12-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-12-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-11-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0569 Published in the DC Register |
2017-11-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2017-11-07 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0569 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/39176/B22-0569-Introduction.pdf |