DC B22-0568 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes a non-lapsing fund to provide additional funding to maintain and improve the transportation system of the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority. This fund is subject to the passage of legislation by the Maryland General Assembly and the Virginia General Assembly dedicating an equivalent increase in sales tax revenue.
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Dedicated Funding Act Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-01-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-11-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0568 Published in the DC Register |
2017-11-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2017-11-07 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0568 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/39175/B22-0568-Introduction.pdf |