DC B22-0560 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-14 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill mandates automatic sealing of criminal records for non-convictions, shortens the waiting periods before a person is eligible to seal their record, and expands the eligibility of who can seal their record.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Second Chance Amendment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-14CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-11-17CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-11-10CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0560 Published in the DC Register
2017-11-07CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2017-11-06CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback