DC B22-0557 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0132 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0132 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill symbolically designates the 1200 block of Saratoga Avenue N.E., in Ward 5, as Israel Baptist Church Way.
Title
Israel Baptist Church Way Designation Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Council | Law Number L22-0132 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018 |
2018-06-04 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Council | Act A22-0351 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5763 |
2018-05-15 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0351 |
2018-05-15 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0351 |
2018-05-07 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-04-10 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-04-06 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-03-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0557 |
2018-02-26 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-02-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-01-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-11-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0557 Published in the DC Register |
2017-11-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-11-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |