DC B22-0544 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-08 - Act A22-0195, Expires on February 27, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12407
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-08 - Act A22-0195, Expires on February 27, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12407
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Respite Services Exemption Emergency Amendment Act Of 2017
Title
Medical Respite Services Exemption Emergency Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-08 | Council | Act A22-0195, Expires on February 27, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12407 |
2017-11-29 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0195 |
2017-11-29 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0195 |
2017-11-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 30, 2017 |
2017-11-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-11-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-11-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |