DC B22-0539 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Law Number L22-0092 Effective from May 5, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill designates the unit block of Wisconsin Avenue, N.W., between Davis and Edmunds Streets, S.E., As Boris Nemtsov Plaza. The plaza is in Ward 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Boris Nemtsov Plaza Designation Act Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25CouncilLaw Number L22-0092 Effective from May 5, 2018
2018-03-26CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2018-03-16CouncilAct A22-0276 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2642
2018-03-08CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0276
2018-03-08CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0276
2018-02-28CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 14, 2018
2018-02-06CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-01-09CouncilFirst Reading CC
2018-01-03CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2017-12-19CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0539
2017-12-06CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-11-17CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-11-10CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0539 Published in the DC Register
2017-11-07CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2017-10-31CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback